Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Albin von Helfenburg

Deceased

Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Oct 1574AppointedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
20 Feb 1575Ordained BishopBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
10 Mar 1575DiedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Thomas Albin von Helfenburg:
Bishop Thomas Albin von Helfenburg (died ) Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

  • a bishop for .1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,097
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 262

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013