Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonín Brus von Muglitz, O. Cruc. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Grand Master of Knights of the Cross with the Red Star

Note/Previous Titular See: (O.S.Cr.de l'Etoile rouge)


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Jul 1560AppointedBishop of Wien, Austria
Dec 1560²Ordained BishopBishop of Wien, Austria
1561²AppointedGrand Master of Knights of the Cross with the Red Star
5 Sep 1561AppointedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
28 Aug 1580DiedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonín Brus von Muglitz
Archbishop Antonín Brus von Muglitz O. Cruc. (died ) Archbishop of Praha {Prague}

  • a bishop for 19.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 333, and Page 279
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1560, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018