Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcin Gerstmann

Deceased

Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1527Born
31 Aug 157447.4AppointedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
6 Feb 157547.9Ordained BishopBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
23 May 158558.2DiedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

MicroData Summary for Marcin Gerstmann (VIAF: 47145977)
Bishop Marcin Gerstmann (born , died ) Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBolesławcu
Ordained BishopCathedral, Breslau, Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau)

  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 337
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1575, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast