Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juan Cardinal de Borja Lanzol de Romaní

Deceased

Archbishop of Monreale

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople

Bishop of Ferrara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1446²BornValencia
13 Sep 148337.6AppointedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
31 Aug 149246.6Elevated to Cardinal
31 Aug 149246.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
8 Feb 149347.1AppointedAdministrator of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
29 Oct 149448.8AppointedBishop of Ferrara, Italy
30 Jan 149751.0ResignedAdministrator of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
14 Jun 149751.4InstalledBishop of Ferrara, Italy
24 Apr 150357.3AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
1 Aug 150357.5DiedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Borja Lanzol de Romaní:
Juan Cardinal de Borja Lanzol de Romaní (died ) Archbishop of Monreale

  • a cardinal for 10.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 31 Aug 1492

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015