Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Karl Joseph Ignaz von Lothringen

Deceased

Archbishop-Elect of Trier

Bishop of Osnabrück


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1680BornWien
13 Sep 169413.8SelectedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
20 Nov 169414.0ConfirmedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
14 Apr 169817.4SelectedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
27 Sep 169817.8ConfirmedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
24 Sep 171029.8SelectedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
6 Jan 171130.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
4 Dec 171535.0DiedArchbishop-Elect of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Karl Joseph Ignaz von Lothringen:
Priest Karl Joseph Ignaz von Lothringen (born , died ) Archbishop-Elect of Trier

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 296, and Page 299
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 387

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013