Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vilém Prusinovský z Víckova

Deceased

Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1534¹Born
13 Apr 156531.2AppointedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
20 Jan 156632.0Ordained BishopBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
16 Jun 157238.4DiedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vilém Prusinovský z Víckova (VIAF: 84363535)
Bishop Vilém Prusinovský z Víckova (born 1534, died ) Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSaint Wenceslaus, Cathedral, Olmütz, Diocese of Olomouc (Olmütz)

  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,094
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1566, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 262

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast