Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joannes Wenceslaus von Freyenfels

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc

Titular Bishop of Marcopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1705³BornBrno
8 Dec 172621.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
16 Apr 172923.4Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 177166.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
16 Dec 177166.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Marcopolis
2 Feb 177266.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marcopolis
17 Oct 177670.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joannes Wenceslaus von Freyenfels:
Bishop Joannes Wenceslaus von Freyenfels (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 276, and Page 453
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 16 May 2015