Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Josef von Gondola, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Nordic Missions

Titular Bishop of Tempe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1711³BornWien, Austria
15 Aug 173018.6ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
19 Jun 173422.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
4 Jun 173523.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
24 Jan 175240.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
24 Jan 175240.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tempe
2 Jul 175240.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tempe
1761²49.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nordic Missions, Germany
5 Mar 177462.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Nordic Missions, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franz Josef von Gondola:
Bishop Franz Josef von Gondola O.S.B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Nordic Missions

  • a priest for 38.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1752, Number 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 396, and Page 453
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 455

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 17 Dec 2015