Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Bernardin Verbeck, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Münster

Titular Bishop of Theveste


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1686³BornAntwerp
170518.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
11 Mar 171327.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
1 Apr 171327.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
19 Sep 174660.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
19 Sep 174660.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Theveste
1 Nov 174660.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Theveste
Dec 1756³70.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franz Bernardin Verbeck:
Bishop Franz Bernardin Verbeck O.F.M. Conv. (born , died Dec 1756) Auxiliary Bishop of Münster

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1746, Number 48
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 395, and Page 453
  • ob: ATh, 29 Oct 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015