Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Franz Anton von Sirgenstein

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

Titular Bishop of Uthina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1683³BornMeersburg
23 Sep 171330.0Ordained PriestPriest of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
23 Sep 172239.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
23 Sep 172239.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Uthina
6 Dec 172239.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Uthina
29 Jan 173955.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Franz Anton von Sirgenstein:
Bishop Johann Franz Anton von Sirgenstein (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

  • a priest for 25.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 400
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015