Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Karl Joseph von Österreich

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Passau

Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1649³BornWien
13 Apr 166212.6SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Passau, Germany
1 Sep 166213.0ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Passau, Germany
20 Nov 166213.2SucceededBishop of Passau, Germany
23 Apr 166313.7AppointedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
23 Apr 166313.7AppointedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
26 Jan 166414.4DiedBishop-Elect of Passau, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Karl Joseph von Österreich:
Father Karl Joseph von Österreich (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Passau

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 275

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 6 Feb 2015