Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanisław Pawłowski

Deceased

Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Aug 1579AppointedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
10 Jan 1580Ordained BishopBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
2 Jun 1598DiedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Pawłowski (VIAF: 13734472)
Bishop Stanisław Pawłowski (died ) Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopOlmütz, Diocese of Olomouc (Olmütz)

  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1580, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 262
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 55, Number 3,947

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast