Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Kaspar Neuböck

Deceased

Bishop of Wien, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1545Born
4 Feb 157530.0AppointedBishop of Wien, Austria
5 Jun 157530.4Ordained BishopBishop of Wien, Austria
28 Aug 159449.6DiedBishop of Wien, Austria

MicroData Summary for Johann Kaspar Neuböck (VIAF: 37733694)
Bishop Johann Kaspar Neuböck (born 1545, died ) Bishop of Wien

  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 333
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1575, Number 6
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 79, Number 6,407

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast