Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sigismund Miutini von Spilenberg

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

Titular Bishop of Tiberias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1601BornForli
21 Nov 162827.6Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
30 Mar 164847.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
30 Mar 164847.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberias
1653¹51.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sigismund Miutini von Spilenberg:
Bishop Sigismund Miutini von Spilenberg (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

  • a priest for 24.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 336, and Page 378
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1648, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015