Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wenzel Franz Karl Koschinsky von Koschín

Deceased

Bishop of Hradec Králové


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1673³BornBrno
14 Aug 169522.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
17 Aug 169522.5Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
9 Jan 172147.9SelectedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
1 Dec 172148.8ConfirmedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
8 Feb 172249.0Ordained BishopBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
26 Mar 173158.1DiedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wenzel Franz Karl Koschinsky von Koschín:
Bishop Wenzel Franz Karl Koschinsky von Koschín (born , died ) Bishop of Hradec Králové

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 332
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015