Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinand Schröffel von Schröffenheim

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

Titular Bishop of Sebaste in Cilicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1639Born
16 Apr 166223.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
23 Apr 166223.2Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
3 Dec 169657.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
3 Dec 169657.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Cilicia
1697¹57.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Cilicia
23 Aug 170263.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand Schröffel von Schröffenheim
Bishop Ferdinand Schröffel von Schröffenheim (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOlomouc

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 5.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 348
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,697, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast