Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Protáz Černohorský z Boskovic

Deceased

Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Jul 1459AppointedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
3 Feb 1460Ordained BishopBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
25 Aug 1482DiedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Protáz Černohorský z Boskovic
Bishop Protáz Černohorský z Boskovic (died ) Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopOlmütz, Diocese of Olomouc (Olmütz)

  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 206
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,612
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1460, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast