Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kaspar von Schönberg

Deceased

Bishop of Meißen (Meissen)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1395Born
30 Apr 145156.3SelectedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
Oct 145156.8ConfirmedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
Nov 1451³56.8Ordained BishopBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
31 May 146368.4DiedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Kaspar von Schönberg:
Bishop Kaspar von Schönberg (died ) Bishop of Meißen (Meissen)

  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 194
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,597

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013