Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonín Cyril Stojan

Deceased

Archbishop of Olomouc


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1851BornBenov
5 Jul 187625.1Ordained PriestPriest
10 Mar 192169.8AppointedArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
3 Apr 192169.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
29 Sep 192372.4DiedArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Antonín Cyril Stojan:
Archbishop Antonín Cyril Stojan (born , died ) Archbishop of Olomouc

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1923
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013