Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Henri Zdik

Deceased

Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Mar 1126AppointedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
31 Oct 1126Ordained BishopBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
25 Jun 1150DiedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for St. Henri Zdik
Bishop St. Henri Zdik (died ) Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopMainz, Archdiocese of Mainz, Germany

  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Page 297
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,792

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast