Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Peter Gelyto (Wurst, Jelito)

Deceased

Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1325²Born
10 Jun 135631.4AppointedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
9 Jun 136843.4AppointedBishop of Litomyšl, Czech Republic
13 Oct 137146.7AppointedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
1381²56.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
12 Feb 138762.1DiedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter Gelyto (Wurst, Jelito) (VIAF: 95381329)
Archbishop Peter Gelyto (Wurst, Jelito) (born 1325, died ) Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNieder-Johnsdorf

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 321, and Page 318
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 219, and Page 376
  • b: CB, 16 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast