Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Ibáñez de la Madrid y Bustamente

Deceased

Bishop of Ceuta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1649BornComillas, Spain
17 Feb 167424.9Ordained PriestPriest
24 Oct 167829.5SelectedBishop of Trivento, Italy
10 Apr 167930.0ConfirmedBishop of Trivento, Italy
16 Apr 167930.0Ordained BishopBishop of Trivento, Italy
2 Oct 168435.5AppointedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
9 Jun 168738.2AppointedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
5 Apr 169445.0DiedBishop of Ceuta, Spain

MicroData Summary for Diego Ibáñez de la Madrid y Bustamente:
Bishop Diego Ibáñez de la Madrid y Bustamente (born , died ) Bishop of Ceuta

  • a priest for 20.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 325, and Page 354
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 390
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 219, Number 1,360

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013