Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teodoro Gennaro, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1617¹Born
9 Apr 166851.2AppointedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
15 Apr 166851.2Ordained BishopBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
1681¹64.0DiedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Teodoro Gennaro
Bishop Teodoro Gennaro O.F.M. (born 1617, died 1681) Bishop of Krk (Veglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVicence

  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 406
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1668, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018