Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bonaventura Poerio, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Salerno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1648Born
11 Nov 169749.7AppointedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
17 Nov 169749.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
18 Nov 172274.7DiedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bonaventura Poerio
Archbishop Bonaventura Poerio O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Archbishop of Salerno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTaverna

  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 340
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,697, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast