Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Fortezza

Deceased

Bishop of Siracusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1621¹BornMallorca
14 Dec 167655.9AppointedBishop of Siracusa, Italy
20 Dec 167655.9Ordained BishopBishop of Siracusa, Italy
13 Nov 169372.8DiedBishop of Siracusa, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Fortezza:
Bishop Francesco Fortezza (born 1621, died ) Bishop of Siracusa

  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 366
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 214, Number 1,336
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1676, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 23 Jun 2015