Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo de Cordova (de’ duchi di Suessa)

Deceased

Bishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1653³BornNapoli
14 Sep 168734.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Sep 168734.3Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 169743.8AppointedBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy
8 Apr 169743.8Ordained BishopBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy
1698¹44.6DiedBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filippo de Cordova (de’ duchi di Suessa):
Bishop Filippo de Cordova (de’ duchi di Suessa) (born ) Bishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia)

  • a priest for 10.3 years
  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 215
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013