Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop NicolÚ Cervini

Deceased

Bishop of Lavello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1666BornNapoli
30 Nov 169024.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
3 Dec 169024.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 May 170033.5AppointedBishop of Lavello, Italy
1 Jun 170033.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lavello, Italy
24 Oct 172861.9DiedBishop of Lavello, Italy

MicroData Summary for NicolÚ Cervini:
Bishop NicolÚ Cervini (born , died ) Bishop of Lavello

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 239
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1700, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 5 May 2015