Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Guzzoni, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1632³BornBenevento
13 May 165320.6ProfessedMember of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
19 Dec 165422.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
18 Sep 165522.9Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
13 Jan 168148.2AppointedBishop of Sora, Italy
26 Jan 168148.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sora, Italy
5 Dec 170270.1ResignedBishop of Sora, Italy
8 Nov 170472.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Sora, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Guzzoni:
Bishop Tommaso Guzzoni C.O. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sora

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 360
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1681, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 5 May 2015