Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Biagio Terzi

Deceased

Bishop of Isernia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1653BornLauria
22 Dec 169846.0AppointedBishop of Isernia, Italy
28 Dec 169846.0Ordained BishopBishop of Isernia, Italy
May 171764.3DiedBishop of Isernia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Biagio Terzi:
Bishop Biagio Terzi Bishop of Isernia

  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 230

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013