Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Savo de’ Panicoli

Deceased

Bishop of Termoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1629¹BornRoma
7 Jun 165930.4Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 167748.9AppointedBishop of Termoli, Italy
2 Jan 167849.0Ordained BishopBishop of Termoli, Italy
Nov 1687³58.8DiedBishop of Termoli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Savo de’ Panicoli:
Bishop Antonio Savo de’ Panicoli (born 1629, died Nov 1687) Bishop of Termoli

  • a priest for 28.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 376
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1678, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 18 Apr 2015