Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Cito

Deceased

Bishop of Lettere (-Gragnano)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1633BornNapoli
15 Mar 167137.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 Mar 167138.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 169865.7AppointedBishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy
28 Dec 169865.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy
15 Oct 170875.5DiedBishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Cito:
Bishop Giovanni Cito (born , died ) Bishop of Lettere (-Gragnano)

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 246
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1698, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 3 May 2015