Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emanuele Cicatelli

Deceased

Bishop of Avellino e Frigento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1651³BornSan Atheme
13 Mar 167726.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 May 170049.2AppointedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
1 Jun 170049.2Ordained BishopBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
17 Dec 170352.8DiedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Emanuele Cicatelli:
Bishop Emanuele Cicatelli (born , died ) Bishop of Avellino e Frigento

  • a priest for 26.7 years
  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 109
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1700, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 5 May 2015