Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Morgioni

Deceased

Bishop of Minori, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1661³Born
27 Dec 168827.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Dec 168827.3Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 169837.2AppointedBishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia), Italy
21 Dec 169837.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia), Italy
18 May 170543.7AppointedBishop of Minori, Italy
18 Nov 171251.2DiedBishop of Minori, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Morgioni
Bishop Francesco Morgioni (born , died ) Bishop of Minori

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIschia

  • a priest for 23.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 270, and Page 337
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,698, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast