Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Orazio Minimi

Deceased

Bishop of Segni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1646Born
29 Sep 167024.6Ordained PriestPriest
5 Oct 169953.6AppointedBishop of Segni, Italy
11 Oct 169953.6Ordained BishopBishop of Segni, Italy
Jul 1701³55.3DiedBishop of Segni, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Orazio Minimi
Bishop Orazio Minimi (born , died Jul 1701) Bishop of Segni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceViterbo

  • a priest for 30.7 years
  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 357
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1699, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast