Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippus Albini

Deceased

Bishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1649Born
5 Oct 169950.6AppointedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
18 Oct 169950.7Ordained BishopBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
26 Oct 172273.7DiedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Philippus Albini
Bishop Philippus Albini (born , died ) Bishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBenevento

  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 71
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,699, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast