Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Girgenti, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Patti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1639Born
27 Jan 166424.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
29 Mar 166424.8Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
11 Apr 169959.8AppointedBishop of Patti, Italy
12 Apr 169959.8Ordained BishopBishop of Patti, Italy
25 Sep 170162.3DiedBishop of Patti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Girgenti
Bishop Francesco Girgenti C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Patti

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo

  • a priest for 37.4 years
  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • c34: CB, 17 Mar 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1699, Number 6
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 303

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast