Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Antonio Ruggiero

Deceased

Bishop of Vieste, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1661Born
13 Jul 168726.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Jul 168726.4Ordained PriestPriest
14 May 170342.2AppointedBishop of Vieste, Italy
20 May 170342.2Ordained BishopBishop of Vieste, Italy
8 Oct 170443.6DiedBishop of Vieste, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Antonio Ruggiero
Bishop Giovanni Antonio Ruggiero (born , died ) Bishop of Vieste

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalerno, Archdiocese of Salerno
Ordained BishopSanta Lucia alle Botteghe Oscure, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceVieste, Diocese of Vieste
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria di Costantinopoli dei Cappuccini, Church, Vieste, Diocese of Vieste

  • a priest for 17.2 years
  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 412
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 40
  • ob/c2: AT, 12 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 13 Aug 2020

Quantcast