Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni degli Effetti

Deceased

Bishop of Molfetta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1660Born
18 Jul 170141.4AppointedBishop of Molfetta, Italy
31 Jul 170141.4Ordained BishopBishop of Molfetta, Italy
1712²51.8DiedBishop of Molfetta, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni degli Effetti
Bishop Giovanni degli Effetti (born , died 1712) Bishop of Molfetta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 265
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1701, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018