Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alessandro Sforza

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Savoy

Titular Archbishop of Neocaesarea in Ponto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1658BornViterbo
13 Jun 169536.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Neocaesarea in Ponto
19 Jun 169536.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Neocaesarea in Ponto
24 Jun 169536.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
8 Apr 170142.6DiedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Sforza
Archbishop Alessandro Sforza (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Savoy

  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 284
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1695, Number 18
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 260

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016