Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonardo Cassiani

Deceased

Bishop of Teramo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1639¹BornTerra Nova
31 Mar 168748.2Ordained PriestPriest
24 Aug 169354.6AppointedBishop of Teramo, Italy
20 Sep 169354.7Ordained BishopBishop of Teramo, Italy
5 Nov 171576.8DiedBishop of Teramo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leonardo Cassiani:
Bishop Leonardo Cassiani (born 1639, died ) Bishop of Teramo

  • a priest for 28.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 91
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015