Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Righi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Trebinje e Mrkan, Bosnia and Herzegovina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1670Born
16 Jul 170333.1AppointedBishop of Trebinje e Mrkan, Bosnia and Herzegovina
22 Jul 170333.1Ordained BishopBishop of Trebinje e Mrkan, Bosnia and Herzegovina
12 Feb 172756.7ResignedBishop of Trebinje e Mrkan, Bosnia and Herzegovina

MicroData Summary for Antonio Righi
Bishop Antonio Righi (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Trebinje e Mrkan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRasusa

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 255
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018