Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Missiroli

Deceased

Bishop of Bertinoro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1659Born
8 Aug 170142.5AppointedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
22 Aug 170142.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
26 Jan 173475.0DiedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Missiroli
Bishop Giovanni Battista Missiroli (born , died ) Bishop of Bertinoro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBertinoro, Diocese of Bertinoro
Ordained BishopSant’Ignazio, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Bertinoro, Diocese of Bertinoro

  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1733
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 126
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1701, Number 26
  • ob/c2/d: AT, 21 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast