Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Cavalcanti, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pozzuoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1645³BornCosenza
26 May 166823.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
22 May 171368.3AppointedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
28 May 171368.3Ordained BishopBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
31 Jul 172378.5DiedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Cavalcanti:
Bishop Pietro Cavalcanti C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Pozzuoli

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 325
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1713, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 4 Jul 2015