Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio San Felice

Deceased

Bishop of Nard˛


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1659BornNapoli
20 Sep 168122.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
13 Mar 168323.6Ordained PriestPriest
28 Nov 170748.4AppointedBishop of Nard˛, Italy
4 Dec 170748.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nard˛, Italy
1 Jan 173676.4DiedBishop of Nard˛, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio San Felice:
Bishop Antonio San Felice (born , died ) Bishop of Nard˛

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1707
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 286
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1707, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 4 Jul 2015