Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Arrigoni

Deceased

Bishop of Mantova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1674³BornMantova
30 Jan 171338.4AppointedBishop of Mantova, Italy
5 Feb 171338.4Ordained BishopBishop of Mantova, Italy
13 Aug 171843.9DiedBishop of Mantova, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Arrigoni:
Bishop Alessandro Arrigoni (born , died ) Bishop of Mantova

  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 254
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1713, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 4 Jul 2015