Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fabritius Aurelius de Agostini

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Amasea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1655³BornForli
2 Mar 169741.3Ordained PriestPriest
5 Oct 171256.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amasea
9 Oct 171256.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Amasea
6 Dec 171257.1DiedTitular Archbishop of Amasea

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fabritius Aurelius de Agostini:
Archbishop Fabritius Aurelius de Agostini (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Amasea

  • a priest for 15.7 years
  • a bishop for .1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 80
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1712, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 2 Jul 2015