Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Maria Giuseppe Fornari

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Albenga, Italy

Titular Bishop of Attalea in Lydia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1674³Born
24 May 169824.1Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jan 171338.8AppointedBishop of Aleria, France
5 Feb 171338.8Ordained BishopBishop of Aleria, France
20 Feb 171540.9AppointedBishop of Albenga, Italy
16 Nov 173056.6ResignedBishop of Albenga, Italy
18 Dec 173056.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Attalea in Lydia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Maria Giuseppe Fornari
Bishop Carlo Maria Giuseppe Fornari (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Albenga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 75, and Page 76
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1713, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast