Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Siciliani, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Capaccio e Vallo della Lucania, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1802Born
28 May 182522.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
2 May 185956.6SelectedBishop of Capaccio e Vallo della Lucania, Italy
20 Jun 185956.7ConfirmedBishop of Capaccio e Vallo della Lucania, Italy
26 Jun 185956.7Ordained BishopBishop of Capaccio e Vallo della Lucania, Italy
24 Oct 187674.1DiedBishop of Capaccio e Vallo della Lucania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Siciliani
Bishop Giovanni Battista Siciliani O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop of Capaccio e Vallo della Lucania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamposano, Diocese of Nola
Ordained BishopSanti XII Apostoli, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 180
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jan 2017