Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tommaso Caracciolo

Deceased

Archbishop of Capua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1478¹Born
16 Mar 150224.2AppointedBishop of Trivento, Italy
12 Jun 152345.4AppointedBishop of Capaccio, Italy
1531¹53.0ResignedBishop of Capaccio, Italy
1534²56.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
1535²57.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
28 Apr 153658.3AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
1540¹62.0ResignedBishop of Trivento, Italy
31 Mar 154668.2DiedArchbishop of Capua, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Caracciolo
Archbishop Tommaso Caracciolo (born 1478, died ) Archbishop of Capua

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 152, and Page 319
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 151
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 257
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 259

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Oct 2016