Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Sfondrati

Deceased

Bishop of Cremona, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1493Born
12 Oct 154349.9AppointedBishop of Sarno, Italy
27 Oct 154451.0AppointedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
19 Dec 154451.1Elevated to Cardinal
2 Mar 154551.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
23 Mar 154753.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Capaccio, Italy
10 Oct 154753.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
9 Nov 154956.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Cremona, Italy
31 Jul 155056.7DiedBishop of Cremona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Sfondrati (VIAF: 74787203)
Francesco Cardinal Sfondrati (born , died ) Bishop of Cremona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCremona, Diocese of Cremona
Death PlaceCremona, Diocese of Cremona
Buried Place (Original)SS. Sagramento Chapel, Cathedral, Cremona, Diocese of Cremona

  • a cardinal for 5.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Dec 1544
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 152, and Page 293
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 105
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1543, Number 23*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018